This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:34:47 (UTC).

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT VS KESHRUN MALONE

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KESHRUN MALONE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

KESHRUN MALONE

Jacksonville, FL 32204-2517

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-8332

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES)

1/4/2021- D22- SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES)

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3785093

1/4/2021- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3785093

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES) - PLAINTIFF

12/31/2020- D19- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES) - PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE -NO CONTACT

12/28/2020- D18- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE -NO CONTACT

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - JAMES HENDON, JESSICA CHARLES AND CELESTE ALTAMIRANO-HENDON

10/21/2020- D17- ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - JAMES HENDON, JESSICA CHARLES AND CELESTE ALTAMIRANO-HENDON

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLAINTIFF'S)

8/14/2020- D16- MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLAINTIFF'S)

SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) KERSHRUN MALONE

7/27/2020- D15- SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) KERSHRUN MALONE

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3691318

7/24/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3691318

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) KESHRUN MALONE, PLAINTIFF'S

7/24/2020- D13- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) KESHRUN MALONE, PLAINTIFF'S

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS, 3/18/20 ON KESHRUN MALONE

3/19/2020- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS, 3/18/20 ON KESHRUN MALONE

SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE

2/19/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617590

2/18/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617590

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/4/2021; SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/4/2021; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/25/2021 1:30 PM - 509 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/4/2021; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3785093

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/4/2021; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE (PLURIES) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/29/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE -NO CONTACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/21/2020; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER - JAMES HENDON, JESSICA CHARLES AND CELESTE ALTAMIRANO-HENDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/14/2020; MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS, 3/18/20 ON KESHRUN MALONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617590

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - KESHRUN MALONE - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D