Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:47:01 (UTC).

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT VS CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER FERRIER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

Jacksonville, FL 32220-2132

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-8332

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

9/18/2020- D19- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE OTHER - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

9/1/2020- D18- OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE OTHER - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 9-1-20 @ 02:00PM VIA ZOOM

7/7/2020- D17- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 9-1-20 @ 02:00PM VIA ZOOM

AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

6/3/2020- D16- AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE OF CHRISTOPHER FERRIER- PLAINTIFF

6/3/2020- D14- AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE OF CHRISTOPHER FERRIER- PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS- PLAINTIFF

6/3/2020- D13- NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS- PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/04/2020 @ 12:43PM SUBSERVICE TO BRANDON FERRIER FOR CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

3/13/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/04/2020 @ 12:43PM SUBSERVICE TO BRANDON FERRIER FOR CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

SUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

2/19/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617579

2/18/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617579

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 19391 PAGE 707-708

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/21/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/3/2020; OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE OTHER - DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 9-1-20 @ 02:00PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE OF CHRISTOPHER FERRIER- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/5/2020; NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/04/2020 @ 12:43PM SUBSERVICE TO BRANDON FERRIER FOR CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617579

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED - CHRISTOPHER FERRIER - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D