Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:45:55 (UTC).

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT VS ANTHONY MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANTHONY MITCHELL. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTH FLORIDA ANESTHESIA CONSULTANT

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant

ANTHONY MITCHELL

Jacksonville, FL 32254-3911

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kidd, Evan D

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-8332

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

6/24/2020- D15- SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679050

6/24/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679050

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL- PLAINTIFF

6/24/2020- D13- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL- PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

3/27/2020- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

SUMMONS ISSUED ANTHONY MITCHELL

2/20/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ANTHONY MITCHELL

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617683

2/20/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617683

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ANTHONY MITCHELL) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ANTHONY MITCHELL) - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3679050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/24/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ALIAS) FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/27/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE FOR ANTHONY MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ANTHONY MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617683

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (ANTHONY MITCHELL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIDD, EVAN D