This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:38:01 (UTC).

NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A. D/B/A EMAS SPINE & BRAIN SPECIALISTS AS ASSIGNEE OF ANNIE COHEN VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P A D/B/A EMAS SPINE BRAIN SPECIALISTS AS ASSIGNEE OF ANNIE COHEN filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEUROLOGY PARTNERS, P.A. D/B/A EMAS SPINE & BRAIN SPECIALISTS AS ASSIGNEE OF ANNIE COHEN

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722738

9/25/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722738

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less