Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 19:51:00 (UTC).

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS PATRICK R STEWART Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATRICK R STEWART. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

1505 N Florida Ave

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

PATRICK R STEWART

Orange Park, FL 32073

Unknown Tenant/Owner 1

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Unknown Tenant/Owner 3

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Unknown Tenant/Owner 2

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roefaro, Nicholas Joseph

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1030

Tampa, FL 33602-5227

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

12/18/2020- D32- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/05/21 9AM - CR 510

12/17/2020- D31- FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/05/21 9AM - CR 510

CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/05/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

12/15/2020- D30- CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/05/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

9/4/2020- D27- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 7/21/2020

7/14/2020- D25- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 7/21/2020

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ; UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 2 AND UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 3

5/22/2020- D17- NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY ; UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 1 AND UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 2 AND UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 3

RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED 03/30/2020 @ 2;14 PM

4/13/2020- D13- RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED 03/30/2020 @ 2;14 PM

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

3/2/2020- D10- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626882

2/28/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626882

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/28/2020- D4- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1146-1146

2/28/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1146-1146

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF THE FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/17/2020; FORECLOSURE CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND MEMO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 02/05/21 9AM - CR 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/16/2020; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 02/05/2021 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202 (PER COURT CALENDAR 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12-15-20 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; CASE MANAGMENT RESCHEDULE 12/15/2020 9:00AM - 510 5th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/4/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/4/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; Case Managment Conference 05/05/2020 9:00AM - 510 5th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; TRANSFER TO DIV. FC-A (CIRCUIT COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $1,066.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626882

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; NON-HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; UNKNOWN TENANT/OWNER 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ; PATRICK R. STEWART A/K/A PATRICK RUSSELL STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1146-1146

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COMPLAINT (VERIFIED MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navy Federal Credit Union Long Term Disability Plan is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEFARO, NICHOLAS JOSEPH