This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 02:02:13 (UTC).

MIKE WILLIAMS, AS SHERIFF OF DUVAL COUNTY VS GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 MIKE WILLIAMS, AS SHERIFF OF DUVAL COUNTY filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOYER, TYRIE W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOYER, TYRIE W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIKE WILLIAMS, AS SHERIFF OF DUVAL COUNTY

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tran, Mai Thanh Thi

State Attorney'S Office- 4Th Judicial Circuit 311 W Monroe St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4242

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO JUDGE BOYER, FROM MAI THANH THI TRAN

7/14/2020- D20- LETTER TO JUDGE BOYER, FROM MAI THANH THI TRAN

DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE

6/22/2020- D16- DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE MODIFICATION

6/18/2020- D15- MOTION FOR DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE MODIFICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE ON 4-16-2020 @ 9:35 AM

4/20/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE ON 4-16-2020 @ 9:35 AM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF FORFEITURE COMPLAINT

4/9/2020- D12- PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF FORFEITURE COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT

3/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

3/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3644328

3/26/2020- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3644328

CASE FEES PAID: $1,001.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3643019

3/24/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $1,001.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3643019

VERIFICATION FORM

3/24/2020- D6- VERIFICATION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2020; LETTER TO JUDGE BOYER, FROM MAI THANH THI TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE BOOK 19286 PAGE 620-620

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FORFEITURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2020; DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT -AGAINST GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/23/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON GREGORY DWAYNE LOVE ON 4-16-2020 @ 9:35 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/10/2020; PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF FORFEITURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3644328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; NOTICE OF FORFEITURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CONTRABAND FORFEITURE; Assessed : $1,001.00; Paid : $1,001.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2020; BOND FILED, APPROVED & COPY PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $1,001.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3643019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; CONTRABAND FORFEITURE (NON-STATE AGENCY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; VERIFICATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF FORFEITURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE-ORIGINAL MAINTAINED WITH ORIGINAL BOND BY THE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; CONTRABAND FORFEITURE BOND DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tran, Mai Thanh Thi