This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:27:49 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS MATTHEW J HIMES

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MATTHEW J HIMES. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

MATTHEW J HIMES

Jacksonville, FL 32226-3049

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Green, Johan Alexi

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO MATTHEW J HIMES ON 11/06/20 @9:50AM INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

11/18/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO MATTHEW J HIMES ON 11/06/20 @9:50AM INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW J HIMES

10/27/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW J HIMES

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MATTHEW J HIMES - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MATTHEW J HIMES - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743247

10/27/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743247

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/20/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO MATTHEW J HIMES ON 11/06/20 @9:50AM INDIVIDUAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MATTHEW J HIMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743247

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MATTHEW J HIMES - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI