This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/28/2020 at 00:06:15 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. VS JUSTIN COPPEL

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUSTIN COPPEL. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

JUSTIN COPPEL

Jacksonville, FL 32225-5519

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Obi, Valeria I

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687-0335

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR JUSTIN COPPEL 2/19/20 @ 08:00PM

2/21/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR JUSTIN COPPEL 2/19/20 @ 08:00PM

SUMMONS ISSUED - JUSTIN COPPEL

2/18/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - JUSTIN COPPEL

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616676

2/18/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616676

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JUSTIN COPPEL - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JUSTIN COPPEL - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/14/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR JUSTIN COPPEL 2/19/20 @ 08:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - JUSTIN COPPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR JUSTIN COPPEL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less