This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/31/2020 at 19:12:25 (UTC).

MICHAELSON GROUP REAL ESTATE LLC VS STEVEN KERR

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 MICHAELSON GROUP REAL ESTATE LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against STEVEN KERR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MICHAELSON GROUP REAL ESTATE LLC

6620 Southpoint Dr S Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

MICHAELSON GROUP REAL ESTATE LLC D/B/A DEERFIELD APTS

6620 Southpoint Dr S Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant

STEVEN KERR

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:37AM EXECUTED, STEVEN KERR

3/5/2020- D16- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:37AM EXECUTED, STEVEN KERR

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623414

2/27/2020- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623414

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2/26/2020- D14- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR STEVEN KERR

2/19/2020- D12- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR STEVEN KERR

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR STEVEN KERR

2/18/2020- D11- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR STEVEN KERR

DEFAULT AGAINS DEFENDANT STEVEN KERR

2/18/2020- D10- DEFAULT AGAINS DEFENDANT STEVEN KERR

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFEDANT STEVEN KERR MODIFICATION

2/18/2020- D9- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFEDANT STEVEN KERR MODIFICATION

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS STEVEN KERR ON FEB. 10, 2020 AT 12:25 PM POSTED

2/18/2020- D8- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS STEVEN KERR ON FEB. 10, 2020 AT 12:25 PM POSTED

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS STEVEN KERR

2/5/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS STEVEN KERR

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608783

2/5/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608783

SUMMONS ISSUED STEVEN KERR

2/4/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED STEVEN KERR

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING STEVEN KERR

2/4/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING STEVEN KERR

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/4/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

2/4/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:37AM EXECUTED, STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623414

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19119 PAGE 2253-2253

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FOR STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; DEFAULT AGAINS DEFENDANT STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFEDANT STEVEN KERR MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS STEVEN KERR ON FEB. 10, 2020 AT 12:25 PM POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING STEVEN KERR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/5/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less