This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/16/2021 at 00:57:38 (UTC).

MICHAEL O. MCCUISTON VS JOSEPH E. BOUCHARD IV Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 MICHAEL O MCCUISTON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSEPH E BOUCHARD IV. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL O. MCCUISTON

Neptune Beach, FL 32266

Defendants

W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

C/O Kathleen H. Cold, Its Ra 10151 Deerwood Park Blvd., Bldg 300, Ste 300

Jacksonville, FL 32256

JOSEPH E. BOUCHARD IV

Hilliard, FL 32046

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gallagher, Vincent Paul

252 3Rd St

Neptune Beach, FL 32266-5130

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Wirtz, Gregg L

329 Royal Tern Rd S

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-6208

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PLTF)

10/27/2020- D2- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PLTF)

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743833

10/27/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743833

COVER SHEET

10/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED TO W.W. GAY MCECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

10/27/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED TO W.W. GAY MCECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH EDMOND BOUCHARD, IV

10/27/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH EDMOND BOUCHARD, IV

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3/16/2021- D12- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2021; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/24/2021; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/26/2021; ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (ACKNOWLEDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 02/19/2021 @900AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH EDMOND BOUCHARD, IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO W.W. GAY MCECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL (PLTF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where W.W. GAY MECHANICAL CONTRACTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wirtz, Gregg L