This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:42:00 (UTC).

MATHCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS (11) LLC. VS Margaret A. Mendez Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MATHCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS 11 LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Margaret A Mendez. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS (11) LLC.

1750 University Blvd. N.

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Defendants

Margaret A. Mendez

Jacksonville, FL 32209

TAYLOR J. MENDEZ

Jacksonville, FL 32209

 

Court Documents

ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT)

10/6/2020- D9- ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT)

ANSWER FILED BY TAYLOR MENDEZ

10/2/2020- D8- ANSWER FILED BY TAYLOR MENDEZ

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

9/25/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT MARGARET A. MENDEZ

9/25/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT MARGARET A. MENDEZ

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS (II) LLC = DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS (II) LLC = DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

CASE FEES PAID: $210.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723134

9/25/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $210.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723134

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION (CDC AFFIDAVIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; ANSWER FILED BY TAYLOR MENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : COPY/COPY FEES; Assessed : $5.00; Paid : $5.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $210.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723134

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT MARGARET A. MENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O MAGNA CARTA HOLDINGS (II) LLC = DEFENDANT TAYLOR J. MENDEZ AND MARGARET A. MENDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less