This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:36:33 (UTC).

MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC VS JAMIESHA SEYMORE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JAMIESHA SEYMORE. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC

1750 University Blvd. N.

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Defendant

JAMIESHA SEYMORE

Jacksonville, FL 32254

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:34AM AS TO DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE (POSTED)

10/7/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:34AM AS TO DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE (POSTED)

NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

10/1/2020- D10- NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, JAMIESHA SEYMORE

10/1/2020- D7- MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, JAMIESHA SEYMORE

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $706.90 CLERK FEE $18.10

10/1/2020- D9- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $706.90 CLERK FEE $18.10

CASE FEES PAID: $725.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726598

10/1/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $725.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726598

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

9/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMIESH SEYMORE

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMIESH SEYMORE

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC. = DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC. = DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723129

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723129

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 3:45 PM; Type : NOTICE OF HEARING; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 09/26/2020 @ 8:34AM AS TO DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING 10/12/2020 3:45 PM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed : $725.00; Paid : $725.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $706.90 CLERK FEE $18.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $725.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3726598

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; MOTION TO DISMISS EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, JAMIESHA SEYMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723129

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JAMIESH SEYMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF MATCH MADE REALTY O/B/O BUDDY RILEY PROPERTIES LLC. = DEFENDANT JAMIESHA SEYMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less