This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:33:11 (UTC).

MARYLAND MANAGEMENT COMPANY FOR CREEKSIDE PARK APTS. VS LAURA J HENDRICKS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 MARYLAND MANAGEMENT COMPANY FOR CREEKSIDE PARK APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LAURA J HENDRICKS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARYLAND MANAGEMENT COMPANY FOR CREEKSIDE PARK APTS.

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

LAURA J HENDRICKS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR LAURA J. HENDRICKS

9/28/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR LAURA J. HENDRICKS

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

9/25/2020- D8- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LAURA HENDICKS

9/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LAURA HENDICKS

COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723315

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723315

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

9/25/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR LAURA J. HENDRICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LAURA HENDICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LAURA HENDRICKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less