Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 03:35:36 (UTC).

MARY C OSWALD VS MICHAEL W OSWALD

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 MARY C OSWALD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL W OSWALD. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILENSKY, DANIEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILENSKY, DANIEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARY C OSWALD

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Respondent

MICHAEL W OSWALD

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dean, Holli Taylor

300 W Adams St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4342

Respondent Attorney

Benjamin, Iana Del

1 Independent Dr Ste 2200

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5050

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Zahler, Jonathan Ashley

1830 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-3404

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION , FMR HUSBAND'S, FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF CLERK'S FEES

10/8/2020- D32- ORDER DENYING MOTION , FMR HUSBAND'S, FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF CLERK'S FEES

ORDER OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) AND ADDENDUM TO CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19385 PAGE 2343-2344

9/25/2020- D28- ORDER OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) AND ADDENDUM TO CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19385 PAGE 2343-2344

NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 09/24/2020 9:45 AM VIA ZOOM

8/26/2020- D26- NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 09/24/2020 9:45 AM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY /MICHAEL W OSWALD 09/07/2020 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 09/14/2020

8/26/2020- D25- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY /MICHAEL W OSWALD 09/07/2020 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 09/14/2020

NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/MICHAEL W OSWALD/ATTY

6/11/2020- D21- NOTICE OF FILING FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT/MICHAEL W OSWALD/ATTY

ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO MINOR CHILD AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF - MICHAEL OSWALD / ATTY

6/11/2020- D17- ANSWER AND COUNTERPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO MINOR CHILD AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF - MICHAEL OSWALD / ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3674287

6/11/2020- D18- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3674287

MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF CLERK'S FEES/MICHAEL W. OSWALD/ATTY

6/11/2020- D15- MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF CLERK'S FEES/MICHAEL W. OSWALD/ATTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IANA BENJAMIN FOR MICHAEL OSWALD

5/29/2020- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL IANA BENJAMIN FOR MICHAEL OSWALD

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638702

3/13/2020- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638702

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HOLLI DEAN FOR MARY OSWALD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/13/2020- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HOLLI DEAN FOR MARY OSWALD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/13/2020- D3- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; ORDER DENYING MOTION , FMR HUSBAND'S, FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF CLERK'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: BENJAMIN, IANA DEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: DEAN, HOLLI TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; ORDER OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT) AND ADDENDUM TO CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19385 PAGE 2343-2344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19385 PAGE 2331-2342

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/28/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 09/24/2020 9:45 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2020; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY /MICHAEL W OSWALD 09/07/2020 THROUGH AND INCLUDING 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/22/2020; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/17/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 08/21/2020 9:30 AM/JONATHAN A ZAHLER-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL W OSWALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT MARY OSWALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HOLLI DEAN FOR MARY OSWALD AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/MARY C OSWALD/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zahler, Jonathan Ashley