This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:28:49 (UTC).

MARK KLEMPNER DC PA A/A/O VILADIA JUSTIN VS SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 MARK KLEMPNER DC PA A/A/O VILADIA JUSTIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARK KLEMPNER DC PA A/A/O VILADIA JUSTIN

St. Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

640 Century Point Suite 1000

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

4/8/2020- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2/14/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614713

2/12/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614713

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 5/5/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/05/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/26/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614713

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III