Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 05:03:30 (UTC).

MARINA GABRIELLA MILLIGAN VS CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAIN Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 MARINA GABRIELLA MILLIGAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAIN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLE, KAREN K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLE, KAREN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MARINA GABRIELLA MILLIGAN

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Respondents

CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAIN

Jacksonville, FL 32225

JUSTIN CHRISTOPHER MILLIGAN

St. Cloud, FL 34772

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Hemphill, Richard Craig

1710 Shadowood Ln

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1135

Hemphill, Kevin A

1710 Shadowood Ln Ste 220

Jacksonville, FL 32207-2184

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON PRIVETTE HEARING

6/29/2020- D27- ORDER ON PRIVETTE HEARING

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF CHILD'S BEST INTERESTS/STATE OF FLORIDA/ATTY

4/29/2020- D19- MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF CHILD'S BEST INTERESTS/STATE OF FLORIDA/ATTY

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAN NOT SERVED 03/24/2020

4/1/2020- D15- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAN NOT SERVED 03/24/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUSTIN MILLIGAN

3/16/2020- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUSTIN MILLIGAN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTIAN MORIGAN

3/16/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTIAN MORIGAN

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE -- PATERNTY TO CHRISTIAN MORIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/16/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE -- PATERNTY TO CHRISTIAN MORIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO JUSTIN MILLIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/16/2020- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO JUSTIN MILLIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

3/16/2020- D8- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

3/16/2020- D12- REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

COVER SHEET

3/16/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/16/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2020; MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT / THE STATE OF FLORIDA, ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2020; NOTICE OF FILING DNA REPORT; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT / THE STATE OF FLORIDA, ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2020; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND NOTICE FOR TRIAL / THE STATE OF FLORIDA, ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/30/2020; NOTICE OF TRIAL BEFORE SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT HEARING OFFICER - 2/11/2021 @ 8:45 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/29/2020; ORDER ON PRIVETTE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/29/2020; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT HEARING OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; RESPONSIVE PLEADING, FROM /CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/4/2020; PROOF OF RESIDENCY /COPY OF DL/CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAIVD MORGAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS CHRISTIAN EMMANUEL DAVID MORGAIN NOT SERVED 04/30/2020 8:01 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/30/2020; NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING - 06/10/2020 @ 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - MARINA MILLIGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO JUSTIN MILLIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -- PATERNTY TO CHRISTIAN MORIGAN FROM STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (NONE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hemphill, Richard Craig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hemphill, Kevin A