This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/26/2021 at 00:13:35 (UTC).

MARILYN KELLY VS RMX CONSTRUCTION D/B/A RMX CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 MARILYN KELLY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RMX CONSTRUCTION D/B/A RMX CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARILYN KELLY

Defendants

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

TIM DELAPAZ

UNITED CLAIMS SPECIALISTS, LLC

RMX CONSTRUCTION D/B/A RMX CONTRACTING SERVICES, INC

LIDOR KANTOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Powell-Williams, Juanita

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

2/13/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615144

2/14/2020- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615144

CASE FEES PAID: $40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618423

2/20/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618423

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

3/16/2020- D12- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

03/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2020

DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT -PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020

FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618423

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2020

DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED CLAIMS SPECIALISTS LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2020

DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO TIM DELAPAZ

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2020

DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2020

DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RMX CONSTRUCTION, DBA RMX CONTRACTING SERVICES INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020

FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615144

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2020

DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020

DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2020

DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less