This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:44:46 (UTC).

M H HOMES LLC VS EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 M H HOMES LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M H HOMES LLC

P.O. Box 488

Yulee, FL 32041

Defendant

EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO

Jacksonville, FL 32218

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

9/25/2020- D5- AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

SUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723756

9/28/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723756

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED EDGARDO VAZQUEZ CASTRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less