This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:05:44 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS STEVE FOXWORTH

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEVE FOXWORTH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

STEVE FOXWORTH

Jacksonville, FL 32246-7099

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hines, Michelle Kim

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/10/2020 @ 12:25PM STEVE FOXWORTH

3/23/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/10/2020 @ 12:25PM STEVE FOXWORTH

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D11- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED STEVE FOXWORTH

2/4/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED STEVE FOXWORTH

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607816

2/4/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607816

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STEVE FOXWORTH :PLAINTIFF

2/3/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STEVE FOXWORTH :PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

2/3/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/10/2020 @ 12:25PM STEVE FOXWORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/19/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STEVE FOXWORTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STEVE FOXWORTH :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less