This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 16:29:47 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS SABRINA G JACKSON

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SABRINA G JACKSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

SABRINA G JACKSON

Jacksonville, FL 32217-2970

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hines, Michelle Kim

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE , PLAINTIFF

8/18/2020- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE , PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 02/04/2020 @ 12:39 PM FOR SABRINA G JACKSON

2/6/2020- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 02/04/2020 @ 12:39 PM FOR SABRINA G JACKSON

SUMMONS ISSUED SABRINA G JACKSON-7061 OLD KINGS ROAD SOUTH, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32217-2970

1/27/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED SABRINA G JACKSON-7061 OLD KINGS ROAD SOUTH, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32217-2970

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602405

1/27/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602405

STATEMENT OF CLAIM , PLAINTIFF

1/24/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM , PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/18/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 02/04/2020 @ 12:39 PM FOR SABRINA G JACKSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED SABRINA G JACKSON-7061 OLD KINGS ROAD SOUTH, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32217-2970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602405

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR SABRINA G JACKSON, PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/27/2020; COVER SHEET , PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, MICHELLE KIM