This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:07:57 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MICHAEL ADAMS

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against MICHAEL ADAMS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

MICHAEL ADAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32225-9048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scherr, Harold Earl

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR MICHAEL ADAMS 2/8/20 12:09PM

2/8/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR MICHAEL ADAMS 2/8/20 12:09PM

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS

2/4/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608249

2/4/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608249

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS, PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS, PLAINTIFF'S

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

2/3/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FOR MICHAEL ADAMS 2/8/20 12:09PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608249

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED MICHAEL ADAMS, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less