This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/29/2020 at 14:15:52 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JOHN REID

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOHN REID. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

JOHN REID

Jacksonville, FL 32257-9233

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hines, Michelle Kim

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

Defendant Attorney

Castellanos, J Nicholas

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

3/24/2020- D14- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J CASTELLANOS FOR JOHN REID AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/9/2020- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J CASTELLANOS FOR JOHN REID AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/2020 @ 10:45 AM FOR SUB SERVICE ON PK REID (WIFE) FOR JOHN REID

2/6/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/2020 @ 10:45 AM FOR SUB SERVICE ON PK REID (WIFE) FOR JOHN REID

SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN REID

2/3/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN REID

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607212

1/31/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607212

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN REID, PLAINTIFF'S

1/31/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN REID, PLAINTIFF'S

STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

1/31/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; > CANCEL REASON - CASE DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/25/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/19/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL J CASTELLANOS FOR JOHN REID AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/2020 @ 10:45 AM FOR SUB SERVICE ON PK REID (WIFE) FOR JOHN REID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JOHN REID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED JOHN REID, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less