This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/11/2020 at 00:27:36 (UTC).

LOUISE CANTRELL VS ARTHUR LONG Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LOUISE CANTRELL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ARTHUR LONG. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUISE CANTRELL

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendants

MARTHA MCDANIEL

Jacksonville, FL 32207

ARTHUR LONG

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elefant, Fred

1301 Riverplace Blvd Ste 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1811

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 09:50AM EXECUTED, MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

3/3/2020- D19- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 09:50AM EXECUTED, MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620926

2/21/2020- D18- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620926

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2/21/2020- D17- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT AS TO MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

2/13/2020- D15- DEFAULT AS TO MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

2/12/2020- D14- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

2/12/2020- D13- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ARTHUR LONG 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

2/6/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ARTHUR LONG 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON MARTHA MCDANIEL 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

2/6/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON MARTHA MCDANIEL 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

2/4/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED MARTHA MCDANIEL

2/3/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED MARTHA MCDANIEL

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/3/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET

2/3/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607691

2/4/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607691

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ARTHUR LONG

2/3/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ARTHUR LONG

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MARTHA MCDANIEL

2/3/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MARTHA MCDANIEL

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 09:50AM EXECUTED, MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3620926

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 19112 PAGE 2086-2086

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; DEFAULT AS TO MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST MARTHA MCDANIEL AND ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON ARTHUR LONG 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE UPON MARTHA MCDANIEL 2-5-2020 @ 01:20PM (POSTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607691

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MARTHA MCDANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ARTHUR LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING MARTHA MCDANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less