Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 20:36:17 (UTC).

LINDA WILLIAMS VS Curtis Cain Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 LINDA WILLIAMS filed an Other lawsuit against Curtis Cain. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA WILLIAMS

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Defendants

Curtis Cain

Jacksonville, FL 32246

RUBY TARRANT

Jacksonville, FL 32246

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) BOOK 19118 PAGE 528-529

2/24/2020- D14- FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) BOOK 19118 PAGE 528-529

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CURTIS CAIN

3/6/2020- D16- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CURTIS CAIN

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR RUBY TARRANT

3/6/2020- D15- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR RUBY TARRANT

DEFAULT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

2/18/2020- D12- DEFAULT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

2/18/2020- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

MOTION FOR DEFAULT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

2/18/2020- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

2/18/2020- D9- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO CURTIS CAIN, SUBSITUTE

2/11/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO CURTIS CAIN, SUBSITUTE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO RUBY TARRANT, INDIVIDUAL

2/11/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO RUBY TARRANT, INDIVIDUAL

CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607179

2/3/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607179

COVER SHEET

2/3/2020- D5- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2/3/2020- D4- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS ISSUED RUBY TARRANT

2/3/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED RUBY TARRANT

SUMMONS ISSUED CURTIS CAIN

2/3/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED CURTIS CAIN

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT FOR RUBY TARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) BOOK 19118 PAGE 528-529

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; DEFAULT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER AS TO RUBY TARRANT AND CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO CURTIS CAIN, SUBSITUTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/11/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/05/20, @6:25PM, TO RUBY TARRANT, INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607179

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED RUBY TARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CURTIS CAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/3/2020; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less