Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 04/25/2021 at 00:12:37 (UTC).

LILA BAJALIA VS HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 LILA BAJALIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LILA BAJALIA

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendants

HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC

C/O Registered Agent Samuel L. Leprell, Esq. 1930 San Marco Blvd., Suite 201

Jacksonville, FL 32207

ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

C/O Registered Agent Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

R DAVID HEEKIN MD

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harwin, Daniel

110 Se 6Th St Ste 2300

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-5055

Defendant Attorney

Allen, James Brent

200 W Forsyth St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4320

Other Attorneys

Sherman, Austin Cole

1200 Riverplace Blvd Ste 800

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1805

Barbour, Jeptha F

Po Box 447

Jacksonville, FL 32201-0447

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS IV AND V OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT

12/23/2020- D18- MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS IV AND V OF PLTF'S COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFFS (ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER-RIVERSIDE'S FIRST)

12/16/2020- D16- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFFS (ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER-RIVERSIDE'S FIRST)

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CE3NTER, INC. D/B/A ASCENSION ST. VINCENT'S RIVERSIDE HOSPITAL

11/30/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CE3NTER, INC. D/B/A ASCENSION ST. VINCENT'S RIVERSIDE HOSPITAL

COMPLAINT

11/30/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

11/30/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT'S R. DAVID HEEKIN,M.D. HEEKIN CLINIC LLC'S MEDICARE/MEDICAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER INC 'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT'S R DAVID HEEKIN, M.D. AND HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC'S FIRST SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION PLTFS AMENDED 4-28-21 @ 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/12/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF R. DAVID HEEKIN,M.D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/6/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTFS CROSS) VIDEOTAPED/ OF PLTF LILA BAJALIA ON 04/15/2021 @1100AM AT US LEGAL SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2021; NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF LILA BAJALIA ON APRIL 15 2021 @ 11:00 AM 225 WATER STREET STE 1200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES ALLEN FOR ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/30/2021; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AUSTIN SHERMAN FOR R HEEKIN MD AND HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2021; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SECOND AMENDED/ ATTY FOR DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/11/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS)TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER,INC DBA ASCENSION ST. VINCENT'S RIVERSIDE HOSPITAL ON DECEMBER 3RD 2021 @ 10;40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; MALPRACTICE -MEDICAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CE3NTER, INC. D/B/A ASCENSION ST. VINCENT'S RIVERSIDE HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3766014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEEKIN CLINIC, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Vincent Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sherman, Austin Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARBOUR, JEPTHA F