This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 15:57:54 (UTC).

LAURA DAWSON, AS CO-TRUSTEE VS JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 LAURA DAWSON, AS CO-TRUSTEE filed an Other lawsuit against JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAURA DAWSON, AS CO-TRUSTEE

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendant

JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 11/20/20, @1:05PM

11/24/2020- D16- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 11/20/20, @1:05PM

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753613

11/12/2020- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753613

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/10/2020- D14- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

9/23/2020- D12- DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR :PLAINTIFF

9/22/2020- D11- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR :PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-1-2020 AT 1:35 PM TO JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR \

9/22/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-1-2020 AT 1:35 PM TO JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR \

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

1/28/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

CASE FEES PAID: $323.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605297

1/28/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $323.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605297

SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

1/23/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR (CTII)

1/23/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR (CTII)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

1/23/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND DAMAGES

1/23/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND DAMAGES

COVER SHEET

1/23/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/25/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 11/20/20, @1:05PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3753613

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/6/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT COUNT I FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER BOOK 19445 PAGE 1705-1705

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUAL ON 2-1-2020 AT 1:35 PM TO JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR \

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $323.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR (CTII)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING JAMES FRANKLIN PINER JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/30/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth