This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 17:48:24 (UTC).

KINNECORPS LLC AAO MARIO LLANES VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 KINNECORPS LLC AAO MARIO LLANES filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINNECORPS LLC AAO MARIO LLANES

1728 South Bumby Avenue

Orlando, FL 32806

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 East Gaines Street Service Of Process Section

Tallhassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dinda, Christopher Michael

1728 S Bumby Ave

Orlando, FL 32806-3202

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT- PLAINTIFF

3/12/2020- D12- NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT- PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS ISSUED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

1/31/2020- D11- SUMMONS ISSUED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

1/31/2020- D7- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

1/30/2020- D6- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

1/30/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

1/30/2020- D4- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

1/30/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - PLAINTIFF

1/30/2020- D2- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

1/30/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3606241

1/31/2020- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3606241

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3606241

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less