This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 15:37:54 (UTC).

JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC VS DARIEL HARRELL Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2020 JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DARIEL HARRELL. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC

6620 Southpoint Dr S Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

DARIEL HARRELL

Jacksonville, FL 32209

NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

4/17/2020- D12- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FUTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

4/16/2020- D11- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FUTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

2/25/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DARIEL HARRELL

2/25/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DARIEL HARRELL

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621662

2/25/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621662

SUMMONS ISSUED DARIEL HARRELL

2/23/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED DARIEL HARRELL

SUMMONS ISSUED NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

2/23/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

2/23/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DARIEL HARRELL

2/23/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DARIEL HARRELL

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/23/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET

2/23/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/20/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/17/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FUTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DARIEL HARRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621662

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DARIEL HARRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NATHANIEL WHITEHEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DARIEL HARRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less