This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 03:21:38 (UTC).

JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC VS ANDREW BLOCKER Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ANDREW BLOCKER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC

6620 Southpoint Drive South Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

ANDREW BLOCKER

Jacksonville, FL 32211

NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

5/12/2020- D12- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

4/28/2020- D11- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

2/25/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT NATALIE CECELIA BLOCKER

2/25/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT NATALIE CECELIA BLOCKER

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621070

2/25/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621070

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

2/21/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

2/21/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

2/21/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

2/21/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

2/21/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

COVER SHEET

2/21/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - FILED BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/29/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEFENDANT NATALIE CECELIA BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT ANDREW BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEFENDANT NATALIE CECILIA BLOCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JWB PROPERTY MGMT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth