Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 03:33:36 (UTC).

JUANITA CLAUDIAN BRUNO VS ALBERT HILTON JACOBS

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 JUANITA CLAUDIAN BRUNO filed a Family - Child Support lawsuit against ALBERT HILTON JACOBS. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COLE, KAREN K. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Child Support

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COLE, KAREN K

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JUANITA CLAUDIAN BRUNO

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Respondent

ALBERT HILTON JACOBS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hemphill, Richard Craig

1710 Shadowood Ln

Jacksonville, FL 32207-1135

 

Court Documents

FILED IN EVIDENCE -EXHIBIT #1-CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

5/15/2020- D17- FILED IN EVIDENCE -EXHIBIT #1-CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT CASES INTO 16-2008-DR-6619-FM / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/23/2020- D10- MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT CASES INTO 16-2008-DR-6619-FM / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT HILTON JACOB

3/13/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT HILTON JACOB

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FLA. FAM. L.RP. 12.285 / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/13/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FLA. FAM. L.RP. 12.285 / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JUANITA BRUNO

3/13/2020- D4- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JUANITA BRUNO

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMISSIONS -- SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/13/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMISSIONS -- SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

3/13/2020- D6- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

3/13/2020- D8- REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

COVER SHEET

3/13/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

3/13/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF SUPPORT, ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTION AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING FILE (TO CORRECT SPELLING OF MINOR CHILD'S FIRST NAME)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; FILED IN EVIDENCE -EXHIBIT #1-CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 8:30 AM; Type : NOTICE OF TRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT (COPY) OF SUPPORT/ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTION AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING FILE (INTO CASE 2008DR6619FM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: HEMPHILL, RICHARD CRAIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; NOTICE OF TRIAL 05/14/2020 8:30 AM - 511 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (SUPPLEMENTAL) WITH HEARING OFFICER/NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING 05/14/2020 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (SUPPLEMENTAL) WITH HEARING OFFICER/NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC/ZOOM HEARING 05/14/2020 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; RESPONSIVE PLEADING, FROM ALBERT HILTON JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; NOTICE OF TRIAL BEFORE CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT HEARING OFFICER 05/14/2020 8:30 AM IN ROOM 511

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CHILD SUPPORT CASES INTO 16-2008-DR-6619-FM / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALBERT HILTON JACOB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH FLA. FAM. L.RP. 12.285 / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - JUANITA BRUNO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMISSIONS -- SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; REQUIRED INFORMATION FOR CHILD SUPPORT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR SUPPORT / STATE OF FLORIDA / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SUPPORT IV-D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hemphill, Richard Craig