This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 09/06/2021 at 11:31:19 (UTC).

JORDAN MESSER Et Al VS UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2020 JORDAN MESSER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNITED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARI MESSER

Jacksonville, FL 32226

JORDAN MESSER

Jacksonville, FL 32226

Defendant

UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 1011

St. Petersburg, FL 33731

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jenkins, James Streeter III

275 96Th Ave N Ste 5

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702-2526

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley, Meghan Kaye

208 N Laura St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3500

Boyle, Nicholas James

208 N Laura St Fl 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3518

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BEFORE HEARING

9/18/2020- D15- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BEFORE HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

9/18/2020- D14- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS BOYLE FOR UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

8/21/2020- D13- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS BOYLE FOR UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

5/4/2020- D6- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

5/4/2020- D5- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)P FIRST SET/ TO DEFT

5/4/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)P FIRST SET/ TO DEFT

COVER SHEET

5/4/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3660495

5/5/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3660495

COMPLAINT

5/4/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/24/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS BOYLE FOR UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTFF (DEFT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3660495

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; INSURANCE CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF FIRST) TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF)P FIRST SET/ TO DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS III , JAMES S