This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:35:31 (UTC).

JOHN WADMAN VS KIMBERLY SMITH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 JOHN WADMAN filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KIMBERLY SMITH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN WADMAN

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32240

Defendant

KIMBERLY SMITH

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

10/8/2020- D11- DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

10/8/2020- D9- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 09/26/2020 AT 3:40 P.M. FOR DEFENDANT KIMBERLY SMITH

9/28/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 09/26/2020 AT 3:40 P.M. FOR DEFENDANT KIMBERLY SMITH

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

9/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D4- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

9/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722793

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722793

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 09/26/2020 AT 3:40 P.M. FOR DEFENDANT KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722793

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR DEF KIMBERLY SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less