This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/30/2021 at 11:04:25 (UTC).

JILL HASKELL VS ASCENSION HEALTH, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 JILL HASKELL filed an Other lawsuit against ASCENSION HEALTH, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOYER, TYRIE W.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOYER, TYRIE W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JILL HASKELL

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250

Defendants

ASCENSION HEALTH, INC.

4201 Belfort Road

Jacksonville, FL 32216

WOMEN'S SPECIAL CARE, P.A.

Jacksonville, FL 32216

SUNWOOK KIM-ASHCHI

Jacksonville, FL 32216

ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

4201 Belfort Road

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Margol, Rodney Stuart

2029 3Rd St N

Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250-7429

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE COMPLAINT FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY -PLTFS

12/3/2020- D5- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE COMPLAINT FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY -PLTFS

COMPLAINT

7/27/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

COVER SHEET

7/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3691636

7/28/2020- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3691636

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/3/2020; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF THE COMPLAINT FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY -PLTFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3691636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2020; OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2020; COMPLAINT FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/28/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ascension Healthcare is a litigant

Latest cases where St. Vincent Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margol, Rodney Stuart