Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 03:35:02 (UTC).

JESSIE WADE STONE VS CHRISTINE BROWNING

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 JESSIE WADE STONE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against CHRISTINE BROWNING. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, WCOLLINS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, WCOLLINS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JESSIE WADE STONE

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Respondent

CHRISTINE BROWNING

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Wood, Robert Howard

4321 Roosevelt Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32210-2005

Respondent Attorney

Baker, John Gary

Baker & Rhodes Po Box 1177

Callahan, FL 32011-1177

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF EXHIBIT INDEX/CHRISTINE BROWNING/ATTY

11/12/2020- D34- NOTICE OF EXHIBIT INDEX/CHRISTINE BROWNING/ATTY

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL ON 11-16-20 @ 1 PM, 5 PM, VIA ZOOM

11/11/2020- D31- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL ON 11-16-20 @ 1 PM, 5 PM, VIA ZOOM

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- 11/10/2020 @ 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM TRIAL- 11/16/2020

9/18/2020- D28- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- 11/10/2020 @ 10:00 AM VIA ZOOM TRIAL- 11/16/2020

CFID-CERTIFICATE /JESSE STONE

8/26/2020- D27- CFID-CERTIFICATE /JESSE STONE

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (AMENDED)

8/10/2020- D24- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (AMENDED)

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3653652

4/10/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3653652

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN BAKER FOR CHRISTINE BROWNING

3/25/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JOHN BAKER FOR CHRISTINE BROWNING

CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638933

3/13/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638933

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT WOOD FOR JESSIE STONE

3/13/2020- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT WOOD FOR JESSIE STONE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/4/2020; REPORT EFILED TO DOH/BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/3/2020; FILED IN EVIDENCE - RESPONDENT'S EXHIBIT #2 - FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (CHRISTINE BROWNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/2/2020; FILED IN EVIDENCE - RESPONDENT'S EXHIBIT #1 - GMAIL CONVERSATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/2/2020; FILED IN EVIDENCE - PETITIONER'S EXHIBIT #1 - COPY OF AMENDED FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (4 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/2/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF PATERNITY BOOK 19476 PAGE 1950-1965

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:00 PM; Type : NON-JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2020; NOTICE OF EXHIBIT INDEX/CHRISTINE BROWNING/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2020; VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2020; NON-JURY TRIAL 11/16/2020 1:00 PM - 0 NO COURT ROOM ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/12/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL ON 11-16-20 @ 1 PM, 5 PM, VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638933

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTINE BROWNING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ROBERT WOOD FOR JESSIE STONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT JESSIE WADE STONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT JESSIE WADE STONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION TO ESTABLISH PATERNITY, "SHARED PARENTAL RESPONSIBILITY', A PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT/JESSIE STONE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wood, Robert Howard