Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 03:36:03 (UTC).

JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER VS TASHIMA M WHEELER

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TASHIMA M WHEELER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GUY, JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GUY, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Respondent

TASHIMA M WHEELER

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Galustov, Boris

6144 Gazebo Park Pl S Unit 103

Jacksonville, FL 32257-1086

Rowe, Adam Powell

6144 Gazebo Park Pl S Unit 103

Jacksonville, FL 32257-1086

Grigaltchik, David Petrovich

6144 Gazebo Park Pl S Unit 103

Jacksonville, FL 32257-1086

Not Classified By Court Attorney

DiRito, Vincent James Jr

(Mailing Address Only) 830 A1A N Ste 13

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-3290

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (NOVEMBER 4, 2020)

10/22/2020- D23- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (NOVEMBER 4, 2020)

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AMENDED) 11/04/2020 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

10/12/2020- D22- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AMENDED) 11/04/2020 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER/ATTY

9/15/2020- D21- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER/ATTY

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /JERMEL WHEELER

9/15/2020- D20- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /JERMEL WHEELER

CORRECTED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 N@ 9:00 AM / VINSENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFID FAMILY MEDIATOR

8/31/2020- D19- CORRECTED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 N@ 9:00 AM / VINSENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFID FAMILY MEDIATOR

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 @ 9:00 AM / VINCENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFIED MEDIATOR

8/31/2020- D18- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 @ 9:00 AM / VINCENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFIED MEDIATOR

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION : VINCENT J. DIRITO IS THE COURT'S MEDIATOR; W/IN 75 DAYS

8/18/2020- D17- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION : VINCENT J. DIRITO IS THE COURT'S MEDIATOR; W/IN 75 DAYS

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 09/04/2020 9:00 AM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

8/17/2020- D16- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 09/04/2020 9:00 AM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIGE / JERMEL A. WHEELER/ATTY

8/4/2020- D15- VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIGE / JERMEL A. WHEELER/ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED TASHIMA M WHEELER

3/13/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED TASHIMA M WHEELER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/13/2020- D7- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN JERMEL A WHEELER

3/13/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN JERMEL A WHEELER

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION OF LITIGATION--LINKED

3/13/2020- D6- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION OF LITIGATION--LINKED

COVER SHEET

3/13/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

VERIFIED COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/JERMEL A WHEELER/ATTY

3/13/2020- D3- VERIFIED COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/JERMEL A WHEELER/ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638671

3/13/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638671

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BORIS GALUSTOV FOR JERMEL WHEELER AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/13/2020- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BORIS GALUSTOV FOR JERMEL WHEELER AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/13/2020- D4- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2020; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (NOVEMBER 4, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/15/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AMENDED) 11/04/2020 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /JERMEL ANTWON WHEELER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /JERMEL WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2020; CORRECTED NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 N@ 9:00 AM / VINSENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFID FAMILY MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2020; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/4/2020 @ 9:00 AM / VINCENT J. DIRITO-CERTIFIED MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/19/2020; ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION : VINCENT J. DIRITO IS THE COURT'S MEDIATOR; W/IN 75 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/18/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 09/04/2020 9:00 AM/VINCENT J DIRITO-MEDIATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; VERIFIED AMENDED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIGE / JERMEL A. WHEELER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/15/2020; ORDER TRANSFERRING DV CASE TO DIVISION FM-C COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638671

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TASHIMA M WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN JERMEL A WHEELER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL BORIS GALUSTOV FOR JERMEL WHEELER AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AND REQUEST FOR COORDINATION OF LITIGATION--LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; VERIFIED COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/JERMEL A WHEELER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DiRito, Vincent James Jr