This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/05/2020 at 18:37:57 (UTC).

JEFF CRETELLA VS DENNIS MALDONADO Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 JEFF CRETELLA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DENNIS MALDONADO. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFF CRETELLA

Clinton, CT 06413

Defendants

DENNIS MALDONADO

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Jessica Maldonado

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 10:00AM EXECUTED, DENNIS MALDONADO AND JESSICA MALDONADO

3/3/2020- D18- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 10:00AM EXECUTED, DENNIS MALDONADO AND JESSICA MALDONADO

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623602

2/27/2020- D17- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623602

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2/27/2020- D16- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

2/21/2020- D12- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

2/21/2020- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

2/21/2020- D14- DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

2/21/2020- D13- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SUBSTITUTE ON 2-12-2020 AT 2:05 PM TO JEREMY PENA FOR JESSICA MALDONADO

2/17/2020- D10- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SUBSTITUTE ON 2-12-2020 AT 2:05 PM TO JEREMY PENA FOR JESSICA MALDONADO

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SUBSTITUTE ON 2-12-2020 AT 2:05 PM TO JEREMY PENA FOR JESSICA MALDONADO

2/17/2020- D9- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SUBSTITUTE ON 2-12-2020 AT 2:05 PM TO JEREMY PENA FOR JESSICA MALDONADO

CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613484

2/12/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613484

AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON ROBIN L GOODEN DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF CRETELLA, JEFF (PLAINTIFF)

2/12/2020- D7- AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON ROBIN L GOODEN DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF CRETELLA, JEFF (PLAINTIFF)

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT DENNIS MALDONADO & JESSICA MALDONADO

2/12/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT DENNIS MALDONADO & JESSICA MALDONADO

SUMMONS ISSUED JESSICA MALDONADO

2/12/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED JESSICA MALDONADO

SUMMONS ISSUED DENNIS MALDONADO

2/12/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DENNIS MALDONADO

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

2/12/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

2/12/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/02/2020 10:00AM EXECUTED, DENNIS MALDONADO AND JESSICA MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3623602

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19120 PAGE 137-137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO JESSICA AND DENNIS MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SUBSTITUTE ON 2-12-2020 AT 2:05 PM TO JEREMY PENA FOR JESSICA MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON ROBIN L GOODEN DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF CRETELLA, JEFF (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT DENNIS MALDONADO & JESSICA MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED JESSICA MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DENNIS MALDONADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less