This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:12:14 (UTC).

JAX SPINE & PAIN CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF RANDALL BOYD VS UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 JAX SPINE PAIN CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF RANDALL BOYD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAX SPINE & PAIN CENTER AS ASSIGNEE OF RANDALL BOYD

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Winer, Melissa Rakin

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Ferreiro, Nicholas A

315 E Robinson St Ste 550

Orlando, FL 32801-1631

 

Court Documents

WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - BOTH PARTIES

12/7/2020- D11- WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - BOTH PARTIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

11/17/2020- D10- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

11/17/2020- D9- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

11/17/2020- D8- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

11/16/2020- D7- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/27/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743200

10/27/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743200

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/8/2020; WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL (JOINT STIPULATION) CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/18/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (FIRST) TO DEFENDANT- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS SHUSTER & SABEN, LLC FILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL NICHOLAS FERREIRO FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743200

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAX SPINE & PAIN CENTER A/A/O ARTHUR S. CHORBAK is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B