Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 07/25/2021 at 02:29:56 (UTC).

JASON CHRISTOPHER POWELL VS JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 JASON CHRISTOPHER POWELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JASON CHRISTOPHER POWELL

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.

801 Us Hwy. 1

North Palm Beacg, FL 33408

JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER

Jacksonvile, FL 32223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pecko, Mark Antoine

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Bradley, Meghan Kaye

208 N Laura St Fl 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3518

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR JURY TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

7/9/2021- D36- MOTION FOR JURY TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JUSTIN WILLIAN GARBER ON 01/25/2021 @455PM

1/26/2021- D19- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JUSTIN WILLIAN GARBER ON 01/25/2021 @455PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON WERNER ENTERPRISES INC ON 12/30/2020 @145PM BY KRYSTLE PARKER

1/12/2021- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON WERNER ENTERPRISES INC ON 12/30/2020 @145PM BY KRYSTLE PARKER

COMPLAINT

11/23/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3762411

11/20/2020- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3762411

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/12/2021; MOTION FOR JURY TRIAL (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/25/2021; CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/17/2021; MOTION TO COMPEL (PLTF) RESPONSE TO ALL OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCTION MADE BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2021; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/15/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF.'S) /TO DEFT., WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTF.'S) /TO DEFT., WERNER ENTERPRISES, INC.'S/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2021; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER'S TO PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT WERNER ENTERPRISES INCS) TO PLTFS FIRST/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2021; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT GARBERS) TO PLTFS FIRST/

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) PROPOUNDING INITIAL TO DEFT WERNER ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) PROPOUNDING INITIAL TO DEFT JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT WERNER ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO WERNER ENTERPRISES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO JUSTIN WILLIAM GARBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3762411

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Werner Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradley, Meghan Kaye