This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 09/03/2021 at 10:02:41 (UTC).

JANAE NICOLE MCPHAUL VS MARGIE SMALL SPAN

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 JANAE NICOLE MCPHAUL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARGIE SMALL SPAN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JANAE NICOLE MCPHAUL

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

MARGIE SMALL SPAN

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pecko, Mark Antoine

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Newman, Carla Michelle

225 Water St Ste 1585

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5181

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFTS) BY TELEPHONE ON DEFTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ON 01/10/2022 @900AM

8/5/2021- D21- NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFTS) BY TELEPHONE ON DEFTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ON 01/10/2022 @900AM

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

3/11/2021- D19- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CARLA NEWMAN FOR MARGIE SPAN

12/18/2020- D14- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CARLA NEWMAN FOR MARGIE SPAN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARGIE SMALL SPAN ON DEC. 11, 2020 AT 02:30 P.M.

12/14/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARGIE SMALL SPAN ON DEC. 11, 2020 AT 02:30 P.M.

COMPLAINT

11/16/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3756871

11/17/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3756871

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFTS) BY TELEPHONE ON DEFTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT ON 01/10/2022 @900AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2021; MOTION (DEFTS) TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2021; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) TO PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; ANSWER (DEFTS) TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/21/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL CARLA NEWMAN FOR MARGIE SPAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARGIE SMALL SPAN ON DEC. 11, 2020 AT 02:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/15/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE RETURN OF SERVICE FOR MARGIE SMALL SPAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3756871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARGIE SMALL SPAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., MARGIE SMALL SPAN (PLTF INITIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT., MARGIE SMALL SPAN (PLTF INITIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFT., MARGIE SMALL SPAN (PLTF INITIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pecko, Mark Antoine