This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/09/2020 at 18:20:11 (UTC).

JAMES E. HIGGINS IV VS DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 JAMES E HIGGINS IV filed an Other lawsuit against DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SOUD, ADRIAN G.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SOUD, ADRIAN G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES E. HIGGINS IV

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Appellant

JAMES E HIGGINS

Defendant

DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

2900 Apalachee Pkwy, Rm A-432

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Appellee

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF HIGHWAY SAFETY AND MOTOR VEHICLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Cohen, Susan Helen

1125 Blackstone Bldg 233 E Bay St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3452

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

9/28/2020- D4- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723000

9/25/2020- D3- CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723000

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/29/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; APPENDIX INDEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI

    Read MoreRead Less