Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 22:02:21 (UTC).

JAMES CHRISTIANSEN Et Al VS A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 JAMES CHRISTIANSEN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against A G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES CHRISTIANSEN

Tampa, FL 33625

SUSAN CHRISTIANSEN

Tampa, FL 33625

Defendants

RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES, LP

C/O Ct Corp. System, 1200 South Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

C/O Jose E. Pedraza, 730 Gingermill Rd.

Jacksonville, FL 32259

A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

C/O Ludwig & Associates, Pa, 5150 Belfort Rd. S. #500

Jacksonville, FL 32256

COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA, INC.

C/O Charles Jimerson, Esq., One Independent Drive Suite 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

United Subcontractors, Inc. Dba First Choice Supply, Inc.

C/O Corporation Service Company, 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY, LLC

C/O Tilley Callahan, Pa, 4465 Baymeadows Rd. Ste 3

Jacksonville, FL 32217

STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING, INC.

C/O Harriet Strange, 112 Eberhard Ave.

Palatka, FL 32177

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zudar, Joshua Michael

6507 Gunn Hwy

Tampa, FL 33625-4021

Other Attorneys

Ferguson, Elizabeth B

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4327

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF.)

7/21/2020- D23- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF.)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC ON 04/15/2020 @449PM BY HARRIETT STRANGE

6/8/2020- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC ON 04/15/2020 @449PM BY HARRIETT STRANGE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDAL PAINTING INC ON 04/27/2020 @1100AM BY CAROLINE VARTE

6/8/2020- D21- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDAL PAINTING INC ON 04/27/2020 @1100AM BY CAROLINE VARTE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC ON 04/28/2020 @1115AM BY JESSICA WILLIAMS

6/8/2020- D20- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC ON 04/28/2020 @1115AM BY JESSICA WILLIAMS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC ON 04/27/2020 @1120AM BY SUSAN SANTRY

6/8/2020- D19- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC ON 04/27/2020 @1120AM BY SUSAN SANTRY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC ON 04/02/2020 @1120AM BY ZACH SUTTER

5/4/2020- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC ON 04/02/2020 @1120AM BY ZACH SUTTER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

4/30/2020- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES, LP AND UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC. DBA FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY, INC.

4/22/2020- D14- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES, LP AND UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC. DBA FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY, INC.

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FL LP ON 4-2-20 @ 12:30 PM

4/21/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FL LP ON 4-2-20 @ 12:30 PM

COMPLAINT/PETITION

3/5/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION

CASE FEES PAID: $476.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631427

3/6/2020- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $476.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631427

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLTF.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC ON 04/15/2020 @449PM BY HARRIETT STRANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDAL PAINTING INC ON 04/27/2020 @1100AM BY CAROLINE VARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC ON 04/28/2020 @1115AM BY JESSICA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/9/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC ON 04/27/2020 @1120AM BY SUSAN SANTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; NOTICE (A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INCS) OF JOINDER TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP'S AND UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY'S MOTION TO STAY PR ABATE PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC ON 04/02/2020 @1120AM BY ZACH SUTTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/23/2020; MOTION TO STAY BY RICHARD AMERICAN HOMES OF FL LP AND UNITED SUB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/23/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES, LP AND UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC. DBA FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC., D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PEDEL PAINTING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO A & G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC is a litigant