Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 16:42:58 (UTC).

JACONI LANE VS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2020 JACONI LANE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACONI LANE

Jax, FL 32210

Defendant

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

475 Anton Blvd

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Sinel, Genna Leigh

600 Brickell Ave Ste 3300

Miami, FL 33131-3072

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D16- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D15- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GENNA SINEL FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES

3/5/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GENNA SINEL FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES

RETURN OF SERVICE ON 02/18/2020 @ 1:26 PM CORPORATE SERVED TO DONNA MOCK AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

2/25/2020- D10- RETURN OF SERVICE ON 02/18/2020 @ 1:26 PM CORPORATE SERVED TO DONNA MOCK AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

2/10/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611756

2/10/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611756

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS) - PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS) - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

1/29/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

1/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $175.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603810

1/29/2020- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $175.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603810

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 2:15 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 2:15 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/05/2020 2:15 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/26/2020 2:15:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL GENNA SINEL FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS AND REQUEST FOR NOTICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON 02/18/2020 @ 1:26 PM CORPORATE SERVED TO DONNA MOCK AS REGISTERED AGENT FOR EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (PRO SE) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 2:15 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $175.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603810

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant