This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:36:16 (UTC).

JACKSONVILLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DEBRA DURAN VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 JACKSONVILLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DEBRA DURAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HUDSON, DAWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HUDSON, DAWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACKSONVILLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DEBRA DURAN

St. Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 9091

Macon, GA 31208

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

Defendant Attorney

Kupcinskas, Mark J Jr

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1020

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4354

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/8/2020- D24- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF HEARING -DEFENDANT

5/13/2020- D23- NOTICE OF HEARING -DEFENDANT

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

5/11/2020- D22- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - EXHAUSTION OF BENEFITS- AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW- DEFENDANT

4/30/2020- D21- MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - EXHAUSTION OF BENEFITS- AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW- DEFENDANT

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D20- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

4/13/2020- D19- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S

3/30/2020- D18- NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF

3/30/2020- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D15- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARK KUPCINSKAS JR. FOR GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 4-7.10(G)(3) OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT

2/27/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL MARK KUPCINSKAS JR. FOR GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY AND NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 4-7.10(G)(3) OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

2/14/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

2/12/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615210

2/14/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615210

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/14/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2020; STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/4/2020; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - EXHAUSTION OF BENEFITS- AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW- DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/14/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/31/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEFENDANT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615210

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET) TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kupcinskas, Mark J Jr