This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/08/2020 at 15:53:36 (UTC).

INTEGRATIVE HC SOLUTIONS INC AAO TEYNE ADAMS Et Al VS DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 INTEGRATIVE HC SOLUTIONS INC AAO TEYNE ADAMS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOYD, MOSE L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOYD, MOSE L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTEGRATIVE HC SOLUTIONS INC AAO TEYNE ADAMS

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

INTEGRATIVE HEALTHCARE SOLUTIONS, INC. A/A/O TEYNE ADAMS

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR DAIRYLAND ISURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR DAIRYLAND ISURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

9/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722833

9/25/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722833

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DAIRYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722833

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR DAIRYLAND ISURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less