This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:46:10 (UTC).

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O VALERIE CALIFAR VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O VALERIE CALIFAR filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O VALERIE CALIFAR

St. Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 106140

Atlanta, GA 30348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

Defendant Attorney

Gagnon, David Michael

50 N Laura St Ste 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3663

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/15/2020- D20- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

4/24/2020- D16- PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

4/24/2020- D15- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

4/23/2020- D13- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

4/10/2020- D12- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

4/8/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

2/20/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617975

2/18/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617975

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 6/26/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617975

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III