Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/26/2021 at 00:13:40 (UTC).

HUE MELODY JOHNSON VS SHAKERIA K. SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 HUE MELODY JOHNSON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SHAKERIA K SMITH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUE MELODY JOHNSON

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Defendant

SHAKERIA K. SMITH

Jacksonville, FL 32209

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/11/2020 09:18AM SHAKERIA K SMITH

3/12/2020- D17- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/11/2020 09:18AM SHAKERIA K SMITH

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631861

3/6/2020- D16- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631861

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

3/6/2020- D15- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT BY JUDGE AS TO SHAKERIA K. SMITH

3/3/2020- D13- DEFAULT BY JUDGE AS TO SHAKERIA K. SMITH

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

3/2/2020- D12- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

3/2/2020- D11- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

3/2/2020- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

ANSWER (DEF.'S) SHAKERIA K SMITH

2/25/2020- D9- ANSWER (DEF.'S) SHAKERIA K SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/19/2020 01:52PM SERVE THE WITHIN NAMED RESIDENT, SHAKERIA K SMITH

2/20/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/19/2020 01:52PM SERVE THE WITHIN NAMED RESIDENT, SHAKERIA K SMITH

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616471

2/18/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616471

AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DANIEL LUCKETT DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF JOHNSON, HUE MELODY (PLAINTIFF)

2/18/2020- D6- AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DANIEL LUCKETT DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF JOHNSON, HUE MELODY (PLAINTIFF)

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

2/18/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

2/18/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION OF TENANT FOR NON -PAYMENT OF RENT

2/18/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION OF TENANT FOR NON -PAYMENT OF RENT

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF HUE MELODY JOHNSON AND DEFENDANT SHAKERIA SMITH

2/18/2020- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF HUE MELODY JOHNSON AND DEFENDANT SHAKERIA SMITH

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/12/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/11/2020 09:18AM SHAKERIA K SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631861

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19127 PAGE 1976-1976

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; DEFAULT BY JUDGE AS TO SHAKERIA K. SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT (JUDICIAL) AS TO SHAKERIA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; ANSWER (DEF.'S) SHAKERIA K SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/19/2020 01:52PM SERVE THE WITHIN NAMED RESIDENT, SHAKERIA K SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616471

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; AUTHORIZATION FORM INDICATING PERSON DANIEL LUCKETT DOING BUSNESS ON BEHALF OF JOHNSON, HUE MELODY (PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST DEFENDANT SHAKERIA K. SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION OF TENANT FOR NON -PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF HUE MELODY JOHNSON AND DEFENDANT SHAKERIA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less