This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 10:46:49 (UTC).

HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FO VS CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FO filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HSBC BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FO

6409 Congress Avenue Robertson Anschutz & Schneid P.L.

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA

C/O Mayor Lenny Curry Or Any Other Person Authoriz 117 W Duval St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

LUKE EVERETT ROGERS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

VIRGINIA ROGERS

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melanson, Kyle Robert

6409 Congress Ave Ste 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

Defendant Attorney

Mummaw, Wendy L

117 W Duval St Ste 480

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5721

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

7/8/2020- D31- CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 19221 PAGE 113-114

5/22/2020- D24- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 19221 PAGE 113-114

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

5/22/2020- D23- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

DEFAULT AGAINST LUKE EVERETT ROGERS, VIRGINIA ROGERS

2/28/2020- D20- DEFAULT AGAINST LUKE EVERETT ROGERS, VIRGINIA ROGERS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT MODIFICATION

2/28/2020- D18- MOTION FOR DEFAULT MODIFICATION

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA ON 02-03-2020 @ 12:05 P.M. /GOVERNMENT AGENCY SERVED KIMBERLY BEATON AS AUTHORIZED AGENT

2/7/2020- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE -CITY OF JACKSONVILLE, FLORIDA ON 02-03-2020 @ 12:05 P.M. /GOVERNMENT AGENCY SERVED KIMBERLY BEATON AS AUTHORIZED AGENT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; VIRGINAI ROGERS ON 2/1/2020 @ 1:50 PM

2/7/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; VIRGINAI ROGERS ON 2/1/2020 @ 1:50 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; LUKE EVERETT ROGERS A/K/A LUKE E. ROGERS ON 2/1/2020 @ 1:50 PM

2/7/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; LUKE EVERETT ROGERS A/K/A LUKE E. ROGERS ON 2/1/2020 @ 1:50 PM

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 03/31/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

1/28/2020- D12- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 03/31/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

1/27/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

1/27/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

1/27/2020- D2- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 07/14/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; > CANCEL REASON - PER ADMIN ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; CANCELLED CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ON 3/31/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 19221 PAGE 113-114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ; DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING - OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603035

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED VIRGINIA ROGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED LUKE EVERETT ROGERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19086 PAGE 780-781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF JACKSONVILLE FLORIDA is a litigant

Latest cases where HSBC Bank USA, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melanson, Kyle Robert