This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/05/2020 at 00:32:22 (UTC).

HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC VS TAWANNA JORDAN

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TAWANNA JORDAN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

2166 Cassat Avenue

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Defendant

TAWANNA JORDAN

Jacksonville, FL 32208

 

Court Documents

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

6/15/2020- D8- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/28/2020 09:45AM POSTED, TAWANNA JORDANN

3/3/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/28/2020 09:45AM POSTED, TAWANNA JORDANN

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621470

2/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621470

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TAWANNA JORDAN

2/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TAWANNA JORDAN

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TAWANNA JORDAN

2/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TAWANNA JORDAN

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

2/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

2/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/28/2020 09:45AM POSTED, TAWANNA JORDANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TAWANNA JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TAWANNA JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less