This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/27/2020 at 12:36:47 (UTC).

HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC VS NORRISSA SPENCER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NORRISSA SPENCER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERITAGE FLORIDA PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC

2166 Cassat Avenue

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Defendant

NORRISSA SPENCER

Jacksonville, FL 32209

 

Court Documents

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

3/11/2020- D11- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

3/11/2020- D10- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFT NORRISA SPENCER

3/11/2020- D8- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFT NORRISA SPENCER

DEFAULT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

3/11/2020- D9- DEFAULT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/27/2020 05:15PM POSTED, NORRIS SPENCER

3/3/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/27/2020 05:15PM POSTED, NORRIS SPENCER

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621505

2/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621505

COVER SHEET

2/25/2020- D5- COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO NORRISA SPENCER

2/25/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO NORRISA SPENCER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NORRISA SPENCER

2/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NORRISA SPENCER

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

2/25/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19147 PAGE 1467-1467

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; DEFAULT -AS TO DEFT NORRISSA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) -AS TO DEFT NORRISA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/27/2020 05:15PM POSTED, NORRIS SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3621505

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO NORRISA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NORRISA SPENCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less