This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/09/2020 at 18:01:58 (UTC).

HEMANT BHIMANI Et Al VS SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 HEMANT BHIMANI filed an Other lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILKINSON, GARY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILKINSON, GARY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEMANT BHIMANI

Sarasota, FL 34236

JAGRUTI BHIMANI

Sarasota, FL 34236

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

140 S Atlantic Ave, Suite 200

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ross, Vanessa R

1800 2Nd St Ste 919

Sarasota, FL 34236-5930

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

9/25/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722966

9/25/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722966

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER OF THE ST OF FL 10/01/2020 VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; NOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722966

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; INSURANCE CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFT. (PLTFS. FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS.) TO DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. (PLTFS. EXPERT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. (PLTF. FIRST SET OF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS -PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less